GA HR1025 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing copper as critical to the State of Georgia and urging for its inclusion on the official United States Geological Survey Critical Minerals List; and for other purposes.
Title
State of Georgia; recognize copper as critical; urge for inclusion on official United States Geological Survey Critical Minerals List
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Adopt: House Vote #808 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/62902 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/209674 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/62902#19656 |