GA HR1016 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing and proclaiming the necessity for diabetes education in this state; and for other purposes.
Title
Diabetes; necessity for education; recognize
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Gloria Frazier [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #585 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52437 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/172259 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52437#15788 |