GA HR1 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by law for dedication of certain existing fees and assessments for the purpose of funding driver education and training courses in public schools with grades nine through 12; to provide that such funds shall not be subject to lapse; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Public schools; funding driver education and training courses; authorize General Assembly - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Keisha Waites [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] | Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] |
Rep. Mable Thomas [D] | Rep. Dewey McClain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
2016-11-15 | House | House Prefiled |