GA HB996 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 4 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to jails, so as to provide jailers with arrest powers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Penal institutions; provide jailers with arrest powers
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Vance [R] | Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #568 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-23 | House | House Hopper |