GA HB991 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem taxation of property, so as to change certain definitions regarding such taxation; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; property; change certain definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #616 (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #628 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #647 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #628 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #647 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-28 | Act 494 | |
2016-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-11 | House | House Hopper |