GA HB988 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 25 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Technology Authority, so as to provide for an annual inventory of artificial intelligence usage by state agencies; to provide for annual reports of such; to provide for the authority to develop and establish certain policies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Technology Authority; annual inventory of artificial intelligence usage by state agencies; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Thomas [R] | Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Beth Camp [R] |
Rep. Stan Gunter [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #491 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-22 | House | House Hopper |