GA HB986 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing that the governing authority of each county comprising the Waycross Judicial Circuit may supplement the compensation, salary, expenses, and allowances of each of the judges of the superior courts of the Waycross Judicial Circuit, approved March 20, 1985 (Ga. L. 1985, p. 3879), so as to increase the amounts of such supplements; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waycross Judicial Circuit; judges of superior courts; increase supplements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #818 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #637 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #595 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Effective Date
2018-05-08 Act 497
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback