GA HB983 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to the state sales and use tax, so as to clarify eligible exemptions; to amend Code Section 2-1-5 of the Office Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to annual license fees for qualified agriculture producers, so as to correct a cross-reference; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State sales and use tax; clarify eligible exemptions; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #839 (Y: 158 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #698 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #676 (Y: 173 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #698 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #676 (Y: 173 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 533 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-10 | House | House Hopper |