GA HB98 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing the Unified Government of Athens-Clarke County, Georgia, approved March 2, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 3560), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 20, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 6556), and an Act approved June 3, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 4250), so as to provide for membership on the Athens-Clarke County Industrial Development Authority; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Athens-Clarke County Unified Government; membership; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #227 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-06 - House - House Vote #25 - Local Calendar (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2009-02-06 - House - House Vote #25 - Local Calendar (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-06 | Act 223 | |
2009-05-06 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-06 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-06 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-06 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-16 | House First Readers |