GA HB979 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem taxation of property, so as to modify provisions for contracting with or between a county, municipality, or the county tax commissioner for services by the county tax commissioner to assess and collect municipal and special district taxes and prepare the tax digest; to prohibit additional remuneration for tax commissioners paid on a salary basis; to provide for recapture of erroneously received funds; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; contracts with the county tax commissioner; modify provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hopper |