GA HB974 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 17 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund, so as to provide that a member seeking creditable service for a period of absence from duty must have returned to service; to change the vesting period; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund; credible service for absence; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #830 - Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House Vote #571 - Pass (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House Vote #571 - Pass (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-03 | Act 631 | |
2010-06-03 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-11 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-11 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-27 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-26 | House First Readers |