GA HB973 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ethics in government, so as to provide that lobbyists shall acknowledge receiving, reading, and agreeing to abide by the sexual harassment policy of the General Assembly as a condition to lobbyist registration; to provide that violation of the sexual harassment policy by a lobbyist shall be grounds for sanctioning such lobbyist; to provide that complaints regarding violation of the sexual harassment policy of the General Assembly by any lobbyist may be reported to the Georgia Government Transparency and Campaign Finance Commission by the General Assembly with recommendations for sanctions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ethics in government; lobbyists shall acknowledge and agree to abide by sexual harassment policy of General Assembly; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] |
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #810 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #717 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #594 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #717 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #594 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 493 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-20 | House | House Hopper |