GA HB969 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 3 of Title 8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fair housing, so as to change certain provisions pertaining to unlawful practices in selling or renting dwellings and the procedures, remedies, and judicial review related thereto; to correct certain cross-references; to clarify that complaints of discriminatory housing practices may be filed with the federal government as well as the administrator of the Commission on Equal Opportunity; to specify how such dual complaints shall be handled; to provide for administrative proceedings to be conducted by administrative law judges; to provide for conforming amendments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Housing; certain provisions pertaining to unlawful practices in selling or renting dwellings and the procedures, remedies, and judicial review related thereto; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #649 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Vote #528 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Vote #528 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-03 | Act 556 | |
2020-08-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hopper |