GA HB957 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education generally, so as to provide that certain charter school employees shall be included in the health insurance fund for public school teachers; to provide that local start-up charter schools and state charter schools shall require proof of residency either at the time of application or enrollment; to extend the terms of members appointed to the State Charter Schools Commission; to provide for ownership and handling of student records by state charter schools; to revise the deadline for the virtual school performance audit; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; certain charter school employees shall be included in the health insurance fund for public school teachers; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #667 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #515 (Y: 165 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #515 (Y: 165 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 375 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House Hopper |