GA HB956 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to reconstitute the Board of Education of Crisp County; to provide for legislative purpose; to provide for the composition and election of said board; to provide for election districts; to provide for terms of office; to provide for qualifications for office; to abolish the current Board of Education of Crisp County on a date certain and shorten the terms of office of certain members of such board; to provide for a referendum; to provide for effective dates; to repeal a local constitutional amendment proposed by a certain resolution act; to repeal a specific act; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crisp County; Board of Education; reconstitute
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #473 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #461 (Y: 124 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #461 (Y: 124 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 408 | |
2022-02-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-16 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-27 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-01-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-01-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House Hopper |