GA HB947 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the assessment and collection of a technology fee by the Probate Court of Echols County; to identify the authorized uses of said technology fee; to provide for the maintenance of said technology fee funds; to authorize collaboration of the clerk of the Probate Court of Echols County with the finance director of Echols County; to provide for reports of income and expenditures; to provide for fund history reviews; to provide for lowering of the amount of said technology fee; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Echols County; assessment and collection of a technology fee by the Probate Court; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #571 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #546 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #546 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-27 | Act 483 | |
2016-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-14 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-14 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported As Amended |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-09 | House | House Hopper |