GA HB940 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for an additional judge of the Chattahoochee Judicial Circuit and Oconee Judicial Circuit, approved May 6, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 570), so as to change the date of election of such additional judges; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chattahoochee Judicial Circuit and Oconee Judicial Circuit; election of additional judges; change date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #672 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #650 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #650 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 386 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-06 | House | House Hopper |