GA HB93 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to eliminate duplicative state licensure and regulation of clinical laboratories; to repeal provisions relating to examination of human specimens and methods for selection of blood donors and collection, storage, and processing of human blood; to eliminate state inspections of clinical laboratories; to amend Code Sections 26-4-172 and 42-1-10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to license requirements generally under the "Nuclear Pharmacy Act" and preliminary urine screen drug tests for inmates, respectively, so as to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; eliminate duplicative state licensure and regulation of clinical laboratories; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #203 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #44 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2021-05-05 Act 223
2021-05-05HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-10SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-10SenateSenate Third Read
2021-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-16HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-16HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-10HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-26HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback