GA HB925 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales and use tax, so as to revise the categories of companies that are eligible for an exemption on the sale or lease of certain computer equipment; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; categories of companies that are eligible for an exemption on the sale or lease of certain computer equipment; revise
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |