GA HB923 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 36-62-5 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to directors, officers, compensation, adoption of bylaws, delegation of powers and duties, conflicts of interest, and audits of development authorities, so as to cap the per diem allowance available to directors of certain development authorities; to provide enforcement procedures for ethics code violations of authority members; to provide an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; development authorities; cap per diem allowance available to directors
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Sen. Josh McLaurin [D] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Rep. David Dreyer [D] | Rep. Shea Roberts [D] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #855 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1421, Hb 1291, Hb 1437, Hb 428, Hb 923, Hb 1039, Hb 1058, Hb 1280, Hr 594, Hr 732, Hr 842: Senate Vote #776 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #691 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1421, Hb 1291, Hb 1437, Hb 428, Hb 923, Hb 1039, Hb 1058, Hb 1280, Hr 594, Hr 732, Hr 842: Senate Vote #776 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #691 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-05-02 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 751 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-14 | House | House Hopper |