GA HB920 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for adoption, so as to allow for the use of the department's information concerning the parties to an adoption under certain circumstances; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Domestic relations; department's information concerning the parties to an adoption under certain circumstances; allow for the use
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #839 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #656 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #659 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #656 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #659 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 473 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House Hopper |