GA HB912 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Spalding County, approved December 14, 1897 (Ga. L. 1897, p. 462), as amended, so as to provide for the imposition of court costs in certain criminal cases; to provide for failure to appear fees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Spalding County; State Court; provide for imposition of court costs in certain criminal cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #637 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #625 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #625 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Veto V13 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Postponed |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House Hopper |