GA HB907 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Effective Date 2022-02-15
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Effective Date 2022-02-15
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 21-2-540 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to conduct of special primaries and special elections generally, so as to revise provisions relating to dates for special elections to present a question related to sales and use taxes for transportation, mass transportation, or transit special districts to the voters in even-numbered years; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; dates for special elections; question related to sales and use taxes for transportation; revise provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #518 (Y: 122 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #509 (Y: 43 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #508 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Passage: House Vote #473 (Y: 137 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #509 (Y: 43 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #508 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Passage: House Vote #473 (Y: 137 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Effective Date 2022-02-15 | |
2022-02-15 | Act 310 | |
2022-02-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-15 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-14 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-02 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-13 | House | House Hopper |