GA HB906 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Heritage Trust Program, so as to condition the method utilized for conveyance of heritage preserve property on the property's amount of acreage; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Heritage Trust Program; condition the method utilized for conveyance of heritage preserve property on the property's amount of acreage
Sponsors
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Rep. John LaHood [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #583 (Y: 160 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hopper |