GA HB905 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 10 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to capital outlay funds under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to embed and extend a sunset date of June 30, 2015, for provisions relating to advance funding, exceptional growth, and low-wealth capital outlay grants; to amend an Act approved May 6, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 288), an Act approved April 9, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 148), and an Act approved April 22, 1999 (Ga. L. 1999, p. 400), relating to the automatic repeal of provisions relating to advance funding, exceptional growth, and low-wealth capital outlay grants; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Act; capital outlay funds; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Jay Neal [R] | Sen. Dan Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #678 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Vote #543 - Pass (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Vote #543 - Pass (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 385 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-02 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | House Third Readers | |
2010-01-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-13 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-12 | House First Readers | |
2010-01-07 | House Prefiled |