GA HB896 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales tax for educational purposes, so as to change certain provisions regarding distribution of the sales tax for educational purposes; to provide for related matters; to provide for contingent effectiveness; to provide for automatic repeal under certain conditions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales tax; distribution for educational purposes; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] |
Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #858 - Disagree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #832 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 168 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #773 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #741 - Motion To Engross (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #601 - Passage (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #832 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 168 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #773 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #741 - Motion To Engross (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #601 - Passage (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Engrossed | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-07 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-06 | House First Readers |