GA HB888 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to transfer probation and intake services of the Juvenile Court of Upson County to the Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice pursuant to Code Section 15-11-69 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Upson County; Juvenile Court; transfer probation and intake services to the Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #491 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Vote #521 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Vote #521 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-27 | Act 469 | |
2016-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-02 | House | House Hopper |