GA HB883 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Rossville to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Rossville, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #460 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Local Calendar Without Hb881 & Hb890: House Vote #451 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Local Calendar Without Hb881 & Hb890: House Vote #451 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Effective Date 2022-04-18 | |
2022-04-18 | Act 608 | |
2022-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-01-24 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-01-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-12 | House | House Hopper |