GA HB883 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 26-2-27.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to written food safety plans, so as to provide the Commissioner of Agriculture with certain authority regarding safety plans; to provide a short title; to mandate certain written safety plans; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sanitary Activity for Food-Processing Enterprises (SAFE) Act; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. John Bulloch [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. Kevin Levitas [D] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #732 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-25 | Act 466 | |
2010-05-25 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-09 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-09 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-02-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-14 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-13 | House First Readers | |
2009-11-16 | House Prefiled |