GA HB86 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 11 of Article 17 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to complaints policy for teachers and other school personnel, so as to provide that performance ratings contained in personnel evaluations are subject to complaint for teachers who accepted a school year contract for the fourth or subsequent consecutive school year; to provide for appeals hearings to be conducted by independent third parties; to require local units of administration to submit copies of their complaint policies to the Department of Education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; complaints policy for teachers and other school personnel; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #785 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #747 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #635 (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2020-08-03 Act 546
2020-08-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-26HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-25SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-22SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback