GA HB858 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 15 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county law libraries, so as to revise the applicability of a provision relating to payment of certain funds into the county general fund rather than the county law library fund in certain counties; to revise the population classification of such provision so as to permit that provision to hereafter remain applicable to those political subdivisions to which that law was applicable immediately prior to the time the most recent census figures became applicable; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
County law libraries; payment of certain funds into county general fund; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Sen. John Wiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #823 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 495 | |
2010-05-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-08 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | House Second Readers | |
2009-04-03 | House First Readers |