GA HB848 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide for uniform election equipment in this state; to provide that direct recording electronic voting systems shall not be used in primaries or elections in this state after January 1, 2024; to provide for definitions; to provide for ballot marking devices and standards and procedures for such devices; to provide for audits of election results and procedures therefor; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; uniform election equipment; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] |
Rep. Ed Rynders [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House Hopper |