GA HB831 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the assessment and collection of a technology fee by the Probate Court of Cook County; to identify the authorized uses of said technology fee; to provide for the termination of said technology fee and dedication of residual funds to technology uses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cook County; Probate Court; charge technology fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #456 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Vote #447 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Vote #447 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 362 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House Hopper |