GA HB83 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 15 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide for recess for students in kindergarten and grades one through five; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Quality Basic Education Act; recess for students in kindergarten and grades one through five; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #255 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #185 (Y: 160 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Veto V2
2019-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-26SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback