GA HB819 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to issuance, expiration, and renewal of licenses, so as to authorize the issuance of veterans' licenses to any person who is a United States citizen and resident of this state who served in the military for an ally of the United States during a time of war or other conflict; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; veterans' license to any person who is a United States citizen and resident of this state who served in the military for an ally of the United States during a time of war or other conflict; authorize issuance
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Samuel Park [D] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] |
Rep. Bee Nguyen [D] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #791 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #757 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Vote #480 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #757 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Vote #480 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-04 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-04 | Act 568 | |
2020-08-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2020-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House Hopper |