GA HB817 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend provisions of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated relating to the Department of Transportation; to amend Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to highways, bridges, and ferries, so as to amend the limitations on the department's power to contract; to clarify the procedures for the posting of a contract bid; to amend the requirements for the classification of roads of the state highway system; to allow the department to require the use of tire chains by commercial vehicles on certain roads during inclement winter weather; to remove the requirement of county commissioner approval for the designation of a local truck route; to provide for a 90 day notification requirement for county local truck routes; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Transportation, Department of; power to contract; amend limitations
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] |
Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Donna Sheldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #707 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Vote #572 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Vote #572 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-07 | Act 773 | |
2012-05-07 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-21 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-02-08 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-31 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-30 | House First Readers |