GA HB815 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting and supporting certain beneficial projects, agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations, so as to establish a specialty license plate to benefit Georgia Masonic Charities; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special license plates; Georgia Masonic Charities; establish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #695 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Vote #554 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 438
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-05HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-01HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback