GA HB813 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 26 and Chapter 17 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to pharmacists and pharmacies and control of venereal disease, respectively, so as to provide for expedited partner therapy for patients with chlamydia, gonorrhea, or trichomoniasis; to provide for definitions; to revise provisions relating to dispensing prescription drugs; to provide for immunity; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pharmacists and pharmacies; expedited partner therapy; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #550 (Y: 152 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-22 | House | House Hopper |