GA HB812 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 36-15-9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to collection of additional costs in court cases for county law libraries, amount, determination of need as prerequisite to collection, and collection in certain criminal cases; to amend Article 5 of Chapter 10 of Title 15, regarding fees and costs in magistrate courts, so as to repeal Code Section 15-10-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to law library fees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; fees and costs in magistrate courts and law libraries; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] |
Rep. Jason Spencer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52445 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/172256 |