GA HB804 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicle license fees and classes, so as to provide for issuance of a distinctive license plate for owners of ambulances; to provide for design, display, and transfer of such license plates; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; issuance of a distinctive license plate for owners of ambulances; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Devan Seabaugh [R] | Rep. Clint Crowe [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] |
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #410 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-01-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-01-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-21 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House Hopper |