GA HB80 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-24-6 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to consent of an insured to an insurance contract and exceptions, so as to change the minimum number of employees required to be covered under an insurance contract or contracts held by a corporation or trustee; to provided for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance contracts; corporations; employees covered; change minimum number
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hembree [R] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] |
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Rep. Quincy Murphy [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #224 - Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-02-05 - House - House Vote #23 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-02-05 - House - House Vote #23 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-04 | Act 115 | |
2009-05-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-19 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-06 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-05 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-16 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-15 | House First Readers |