GA HB795 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Labor, so as to authorize the Commissioner of Labor to perform certain functions; to authorize the Commissioner of Labor to prescribe certain rules and regulations; to provide for definitions; to authorize the Commissioner of Labor to conduct fingerprint based criminal background checks for individuals employed by the Department of Labor; to provide a process for conducting such criminal background checks; to limit the use, dissemination, and liability relating to information obtained from the criminal background checks; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor, Department of; authorize Commissioner of Labor to perform certain functions; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #762 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #844 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #518 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V11
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2018-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-29SenateSenate Taken from Table
2018-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2018-03-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-20SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-31HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback