GA HB769 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 26 and Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to pharmacists and pharmacies and health, respectively, so as to implement recommendations from the House Rural Development Council relating to health care issues; to revise provisions relative to pharmacy practices; to provide for and revise definitions; to revise provisions relative to credentialing and billing; to provide for the establishment of the Rural Center for Health Care Innovation and Sustainability; to revise provisions relative to certificate of need; to provide for the establishment of micro-hospitals; to provide for a grant program for insurance premium assistance for physicians practicing in medically underserved rural areas of the state; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; recommendations from the House Rural Development Council; implement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #769 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #749 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #614 (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #618 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Vote #528 (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-02 Act 299
2018-05-02HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-21HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-15SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-15SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-31HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/769
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/171782.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/173488.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/174356.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/174454.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/176070.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177439.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178983.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15712
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16036
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16032
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16090
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16363

Bill Comments

feedback