GA HB760 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - House Notice to Reconsider
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - House Notice to Reconsider
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the board of commissioners of Gwinnett County, approved January 31, 1968 (Ga. L. 1968, p. 2003), as amended, so as to provide for the compensation of the chairperson; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Gwinnett County; board of commissioners; provide for compensation of chairperson
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Park [D] | Rep. Jasmine Clark [D] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Pedro Marin [D] |
Rep. Donna McLeod [D] | Rep. Dewey McClain [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - Reconsideration Of Local Calendar: House Vote #284 (Y: 69 N: 90 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #274 (Y: 70 N: 97 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #274 (Y: 70 N: 97 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | House Notice to Reconsider |
2021-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2021-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-15 | House | House Hopper |