GA HB76 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alcoholic beverages, so as to specify that counties and municipalities may regulate alcohol licenses as to certain distances in a manner that is less but not more restrictive than those distances specified by the state; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; counties and municipalities may regulate alcohol licenses as to certain distances in a manner that is less but not more restrictive than those distances specified by the state; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #407 (Y: 47 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #109 (Y: 129 N: 34 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-04-02SenateSenate Third Read
2019-04-02SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-04HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-04HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback