GA HB749 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to clarify an exemption for retirement income is applicable to income received by a taxpayer as a retirement benefit from noncivilian service in the armed forces of the United States or the reserve components thereof; to provide an exemption for certain military retirement income for surviving family members; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; retirement income is applicable as a retirement benefit from noncivilian service in the United States armed forces; clarify an exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #738 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #502 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-03 Act 370
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback