GA HB742 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Effective Date
Summary
A BILL to make and provide appropriations for the State Fiscal year beginning July 1, 2012, and ending June 30, 2013.
Title
General appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2012 - June 30, 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Terry England [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Larry O'Neal [R] |
Rep. David Ralston [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #747 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #780 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 143 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #664 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #634 - Passage (Y: 151 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #780 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 143 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #664 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #634 - Passage (Y: 151 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-07 | Act 775 | |
2012-05-07 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-22 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-22 | House Insists | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Insists | |
2012-03-21 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Transmits House | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-23 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-13 | House First Readers |