GA HB74 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to amend Code Section 33-56-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to company action level events, preparation and submission of risk-based capital level plan, so as to change the life risk-based capital trend test in order to comply with accreditation standards; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; life risk-based capital trend test to comply with accreditation standards; change
Sponsors
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] |
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #203 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Vote #30 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Vote #30 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-01 | Act 45 | |
2017-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-23 | House | House Hopper |