GA HB74 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-1-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions regarding revenue and taxation, so as to define the terms "Internal Revenue Code" and "Internal Revenue Code of 1986" and thereby incorporate certain provisions of the federal law into Georgia law; to provide for an effective date; to provide applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; define terms; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #299 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House Vote #100 - Pass (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House Vote #100 - Pass (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-08 | Act 7 | |
2009-04-08 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-08 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-03 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-03 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-16 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-15 | House First Readers |