GA HB73 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Regulated Industries and Utilities Committee
Hearing: Feb 28 @ 1:00 pm in 450 CAP
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 46 of the O.C.G.A., relating to electrical service, so as to require that the seller provide a written disclosure statement with any agreement for the sale of distributed energy generation systems or for the financing of such systems through leases or solar energy procurement agreements; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities; written disclosure statement with any agreement for sale or financing of distributed energy generation systems; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #96 (Y: 125 N: 44 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2023-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-02-15HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2023-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-01-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-01-25HouseHouse First Readers
2023-01-24HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback